NJ A2158 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved P.L.2022, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved P.L.2022, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows member of PFRS who is police chief and fire department chief to serve until age 67 under certain conditions.
Title
Allows member of PFRS who is police chief and fire department chief to serve until age 67 under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1367 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1367 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.9. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-15) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Substituted for S1367 (1R) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (44-32-1) |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1367 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Substituted by A2158 (1R)