NJ A2158 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1472
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.100.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.100.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes use of emergency reserve fund or proceeds from bonds issued by EDA to finance school security improvements.
Title
Authorizes use of emergency reserve fund or proceeds from bonds issued by EDA to finance school security improvements.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. David Wolfe [R] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2241 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2241 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2016, c.100. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2241 (2R) |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Diegnan) |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1472 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2241 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Substituted by A2158 (2R)
S2241 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Substituted by A2158 (2R)