NJ A2152 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1949
Note: Carry Over of previous A1903
Note: Carry Over of previous S2916
Note: Carry Over of previous A1903
Note: Carry Over of previous S2916
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes DCA, DEP, DOT, and municipalities, to provide priority consideration to permit applications for green building projects.
Title
Authorizes DCA, DEP, DOT, and municipalities, to provide priority consideration to permit applications for green building projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2152 (Carry Over) 2021-06-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A1903 (Carry Over) 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2916 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1903 (Carry Over) 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2916 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee