NJ A2150 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1458

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes certain consumer protections related to arbitration organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes certain consumer protections related to arbitration organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-04AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1458 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1925 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback