NJ A2119 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4989
Note: Carry Over of previous S3318
Note: Carry Over of previous S3318
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that crimes of trespassing and invasion of privacy also include use of unmanned aircraft systems.
Title
Clarifies that crimes of trespassing and invasion of privacy also include use of unmanned aircraft systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4989 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1995 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3318 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1995 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3318 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2119 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2119_I1.HTM |