NJ A2117 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4128
Note: Carry Over of previous S2792
Note: Carry Over of previous S2792
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes State to oversee application for and receipt of federal funds Ombudsman by State agencies.
Title
Establishes State to oversee application for and receipt of federal funds Ombudsman by State agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. John Armato [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-23-0) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4128 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2010 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2792 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2010 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2792 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee