NJ A209 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S380
Note: Carry Foward to future A4537
Note: Carry Over of previous A1255
Note: Carry Over of previous S3698
Note: Carry Foward to future A4537
Note: Carry Over of previous A1255
Note: Carry Over of previous S3698
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Disparity in Treatment of Persons with Disabilities in Underrepresented Communities Commission in DCA.
Title
Establishes Disparity in Treatment of Persons with Disabilities in Underrepresented Communities Commission in DCA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A209 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A209 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1255 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S313 (Same As) 2020-12-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3698 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A209 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1255 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S313 (Same As) 2020-12-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3698 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A209 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/209_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A209 |