NJ A2063 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1239
Note: Carry Foward to future S771
Note: Carry Over of previous A5889
Note: Carry Foward to future S771
Note: Carry Over of previous A5889
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCA to establish standards for prisoner reentry transitional housing.
Title
Requires DCA to establish standards for prisoner reentry transitional housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2063 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2063 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5889 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S3358 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2063 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5889 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S3358 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading