NJ A2036 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2123
Note: Carry Foward to future S2906
Note: Carry Over of previous A1994
Note: Carry Foward to future S2906
Note: Carry Over of previous A1994
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Foreclosure Prevention and Neighborhood Stabilization Revolving Trust Fund; places temporary surcharge on mortgage foreclosure complaints.
Title
Creates Foreclosure Prevention and Neighborhood Stabilization Revolving Trust Fund; places temporary surcharge on mortgage foreclosure complaints.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2036 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2036 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1994 (Carry Over) 2014-03-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2344 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2036 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1994 (Carry Over) 2014-03-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2344 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee