NJ A2031 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4498

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-3-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enhances enforcement and oversight of behavioral health parity laws.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhances enforcement and oversight of behavioral health parity laws.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-2-2)
2018-09-13AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4498 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1339 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback