NJ A2030 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4497

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S868
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits candidates for school board to circulate petitions jointly and be bracketed together on ballot; permits short nonpolitical designation of principles on petitions and ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits candidates for school board to circulate petitions jointly and be bracketed together on ballot; permits short nonpolitical designation of principles on petitions and ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12AssemblySubstituted by S868
2018-04-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4497 (Carry Over) 2017-01-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S868 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.20.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback