NJ A2023 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.200.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.200.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises definition of "responsible charge" as it pertains to licensed professional engineers and licensed architects.*
Title
Revises definition of "responsible charge" as it pertains to licensed professional engineers and licensed architects.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2675 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2675 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.200. |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (63-0-0) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S2675 (1R) |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2675 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by A2023 (2R)