NJ A2013 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1943

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-30 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes electronic lien and titling system for New Jersey motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes electronic lien and titling system for New Jersey motor vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-30AssemblyWithdrawn from Consideration
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1943 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2968 (1R)
S1196 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback