NJ A1999 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Approved P.L.2014, c.32.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Approved P.L.2014, c.32.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"The Opportunity to Compete Act;" establishes certain employment rights for persons with criminal record.*
Title
"The Opportunity to Compete Act;" establishes certain employment rights for persons with criminal record.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2124 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2124 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2124 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2124 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2014, c.32. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-24-0) |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-1) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Substituted for S2124 (2R) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-2) (Cunningham) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (41-35-1) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1484 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2124 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A1999 (ACS/1R)
S2124 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A1999 (ACS/1R)