NJ A1991 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4009
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.332.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.332.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires students at institutions of higher education to receive immunization for meningitis in accordance with recommendations of Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices.*
Title
Requires students at institutions of higher education to receive immunization for meningitis in accordance with recommendations of Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S941 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S941 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.332. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-14-9) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-9) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Substituted for S941 (1R) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (61-13-3) |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4009 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S941 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A1991 (1R)
S941 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A1991 (1R)