NJ A1991 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3454
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.73.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.73.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides two elected members of pension commission of closed Hudson County Employees' Pension Fund may be active or retired county employees.
Title
Provides two elected members of pension commission of closed Hudson County Employees' Pension Fund may be active or retired county employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Sheila Oliver [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2722 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.73. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2722 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2016-09-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3454 (Carry Over) 2014-10-09 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2722 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A1991
S2722 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A1991