NJ A1957 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3809

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the Address Confidentiality Program to include victims of sexual assault and stalking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the Address Confidentiality Program to include victims of sexual assault and stalking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-29SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2016-02-18AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2016-02-08AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3809 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback