NJ A1910 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Substituted by S946 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Implements constitutional amendment providing for pretrial detention of certain criminal defendants; establishes non-monetary bail alternatives for release; authorizes Judiciary to revise fees for certain legal programs and services.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implements constitutional amendment providing for pretrial detention of certain criminal defendants; establishes non-monetary bail alternatives for release; authorizes Judiciary to revise fees for certain legal programs and services.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-04AssemblySubstituted by S946 (3R)
2014-08-04AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Voice) (Burzichelli)
2014-06-23AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-06-12AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2014-01-16AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S946 (Same As) 2014-08-11 - Approved P.L.2014, c.31.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback