NJ A1902 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3412
Note: Carry Foward to future S2491
Note: Carry Over of previous A5672
Note: Carry Foward to future S2491
Note: Carry Over of previous A5672
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases maximum number of respite care service hours funded through DCF for certain families
Title
Increases maximum number of respite care service hours funded through DCF for certain families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2844 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-30 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2844 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-30 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Substituted for S2844 (2R) |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1902 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A1902 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A5672 (Carry Over) 2021-06-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2844 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Substituted by A1902 (3R)
A1902 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A5672 (Carry Over) 2021-06-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2844 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Substituted by A1902 (3R)