NJ A1896 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5073
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2044 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2044 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Deaf Student's Bill of Rights."
Title
Establishes "Deaf Student's Bill of Rights."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3502 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3502 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2044 (2R) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5073 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2044 (Same As) 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.204.
S2044 (Same As) 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.204.