NJ A1878 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1164
Note: Carry Foward to future A3262
Note: Carry Over of previous A3822
Note: Carry Foward to future A3262
Note: Carry Over of previous A3822
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain county inmates be provided with reentry assistance before their release.
Title
Requires certain county inmates be provided with reentry assistance before their release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3379 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1878 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A1878 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3822 (Carry Over) 2016-05-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1806 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1878 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3822 (Carry Over) 2016-05-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1806 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee