NJ A1851 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2850

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limits certain payments for unused sick leave earned after effective date by public officers or employees; limits vacation leave carry-forward and requires suspension and forfeiture of certain supplemental compensation. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits certain payments for unused sick leave earned after effective date by public officers or employees; limits vacation leave carry-forward and requires suspension and forfeiture of certain supplemental compensation. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2850 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2578 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback