NJ A1850 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2750

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns equal pay for women and employment discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns equal pay for women and employment discrimination.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13AssemblyWithdrawn from Consideration
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2750 (Carry Over) 2016-03-14 - Substituted by S992
S104 (Same As) 2018-04-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.9.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback