NJ A1799 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4898
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-03-20 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-03-20 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to develop shared decision-making tool and establish maternal health care pilot program.
Title
Requires DOH to develop shared decision-making tool and establish maternal health care pilot program.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Reginald Atkins [D] |
Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] |
Roll Calls
2025-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-10-17 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Womens Affairs Committee Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-10-17 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Womens Affairs Committee Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-10-17 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4898 (Carry Over) 2022-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S3836 (Same As) 2024-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3836 (Same As) 2024-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee