NJ A1798 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1567
Note: Carry Foward to future S1822
Note: Carry Foward to future S1907
Note: Carry Over of previous A1915
Note: Carry Foward to future S1822
Note: Carry Foward to future S1907
Note: Carry Over of previous A1915
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for veterans' civil service preference; creates additional preference benefits.
Title
Expands eligibility for veterans' civil service preference; creates additional preference benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0) |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1798 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0)
A1798 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0)
A1798 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0)
A1915 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1759 (Same As) 2016-11-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1798 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0)
A1798 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0)
A1915 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1759 (Same As) 2016-11-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading