NJ A1769 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1650
Note: Carry Foward to future S899
Note: Carry Over of previous A5261
Note: Carry Foward to future S899
Note: Carry Over of previous A5261
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits certain provisions in and enforceability of restrictive covenants.
Title
Limits certain provisions in and enforceability of restrictive covenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1769 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1769 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5261 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2872 (Same As) 2018-08-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A1769 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5261 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2872 (Same As) 2018-08-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee