NJ A1761 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4809
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.156.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates fencing crime involving stolen domestic companion animals.
Title
Creates fencing crime involving stolen domestic companion animals.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] |
Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Gerald Cardinale [R] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S332 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.156. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Substituted for S332 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4809 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A332 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S332 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A1761
A332 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S332 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A1761