NJ A1753 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4587
Note: Carryover of previous S2574

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.49.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes State sales and use tax and hotel and motel occupancy fee on transient accommodations; authorizes various municipal taxes and fees on transient accommodations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes State sales and use tax and hotel and motel occupancy fee on transient accommodations; authorizes various municipal taxes and fees on transient accommodations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 41 N: 29 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S749 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.49.
2018-06-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (41-29-0)
2018-06-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-07-01SenatePassed by the Senate (21-18)
2018-07-01SenateSubstituted for S749 (2R)
2018-06-25SenateSenate Amendment (20-3) (Diegnan)
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (42-33-0)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-18AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-03-28AssemblyReviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to not enact
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4587 (Carry Over) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S749 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A1753 (2R)
S2574 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4587 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback