NJ A1720 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1953
Note: Carry Foward to future S2801
Note: Carry Over of previous A4532
Note: Carry Foward to future S2801
Note: Carry Over of previous A4532
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cultural diversity and implicit bias training be included in police basic training curriculum.
Title
Requires cultural diversity and implicit bias training be included in police basic training curriculum.
Sponsors
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] |
Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Ellen Park [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (61-11-2) |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1720 (Carry Over) 2022-05-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1720 (Carry Over) 2022-05-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4532 (Carry Over) 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2072 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1720 (Carry Over) 2022-05-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4532 (Carry Over) 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2072 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee