NJ A1718 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2509

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Substituted by S478 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Babs Siperstein Law"; revises procedure for issuance of amended birth certificate for person who has undergone change in gender.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Babs Siperstein Law"; revises procedure for issuance of amended birth certificate for person who has undergone change in gender.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24AssemblySubstituted by S478 (2R)
2018-05-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-12AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2509 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S478 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-2)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback