NJ A1700 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous A1187

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2025 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-03-24 - Passed by the Assembly (76-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOH to establish public awareness campaign and develop policies and procedures to promote recognition and treatment of perinatal anxiety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DOH to establish public awareness campaign and develop policies and procedures to promote recognition and treatment of perinatal anxiety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2025-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-03-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-2-0)
2025-03-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2024-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1187 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback