NJ A1700 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5280
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.229.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.229.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility criteria for designating certain areas as being in need of redevelopment.*
Title
Expands eligibility criteria for designating certain areas as being in need of redevelopment.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1583 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1583 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.229. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Substituted for S1583 (2R) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Cruz-Perez) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5280 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1583 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Substituted by A1700 (2R)
S1583 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Substituted by A1700 (2R)