NJ A1683 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3130
Note: Carryover of previous A3130

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases penalties for energy "slamming" practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases penalties for energy "slamming" practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-18SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2018-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
2018-01-29AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3130 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A3130 (Carry Over) 2014-05-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1990 (Same As) 2018-10-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback