NJ A1683 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - Substituted by S1181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Changes perimeter for bow and arrow hunting around occupied building.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes perimeter for bow and arrow hunting around occupied building.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-28 Substituted by S1181
2010-06-14 Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2010-01-12 Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1181 (Same As) 2010-08-18 - Approved P.L.2010, c.53.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback