NJ A1677 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5827
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Approved P.L.2024, c.38.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Approved P.L.2024, c.38.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes extended terms for lease and purchase contracts for electric school buses; permits New Jersey School Boards Association to serve as government aggregator to obtain energy services for local units.
Title
Authorizes extended terms for lease and purchase contracts for electric school buses; permits New Jersey School Boards Association to serve as government aggregator to obtain energy services for local units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3263 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3263 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2024, c.38. |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (27-13) |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Substituted for S3263 (1R) |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (62-15-0) |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5827 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3263 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Substituted by A1677 (2R)
S3263 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Substituted by A1677 (2R)