NJ A1662 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the court to order the deletion, sealing, labeling, or correction of certain personal information in government records involving certain victims of identity theft.*
Title
Authorizes the court to order the deletion, sealing, labeling, or correction of certain personal information in government records involving certain victims of identity theft.*
Sponsors
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2856 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.126. |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Substituted for S2856 |
2015-08-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2856 (Same As) 2015-09-24 - Substituted by A1662 (ACS)