NJ A1655 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A445
Note: Carry Over of previous A3929
Note: Carry Over of previous A3929
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates exclusion from municipal property tax levy cap for amounts necessary to provide required matching funds to qualify for grants and other funds.
Title
Creates exclusion from municipal property tax levy cap for amounts necessary to provide required matching funds to qualify for grants and other funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (47-27-0) |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1655 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3929 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3929 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee