NJ A1652 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1263
Note: Carry Over of previous A1958
Note: Carry Over of previous A1958
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to use certain energy-efficient outdoor lighting fixtures.
Title
Requires State to use certain energy-efficient outdoor lighting fixtures.
Sponsors
Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1652 (Carry Over) 2018-01-29 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1958 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2328 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1958 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2328 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee