NJ A1650 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1769
Note: Carry Over of previous S2872
Note: Carry Over of previous S2872
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits certain provisions in and enforceability of restrictive covenants.
Title
Limits certain provisions in and enforceability of restrictive covenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1769 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S899 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2872 (Carry Over) 2018-08-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S899 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2872 (Carry Over) 2018-08-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee