NJ A1625 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5301
Note: Carry Over of previous S3691
Note: Carry Over of previous S3691
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.239.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.239.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DOE to develop outreach program to encourage young women and minorities to pursue post-secondary degrees and careers in STEM.
Title
Directs DOE to develop outreach program to encourage young women and minorities to pursue post-secondary degrees and careers in STEM.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2854 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2854 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.239. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted for S2854 (1R) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5301 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2854 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A1625 (1R)
S3655 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3691 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2854 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A1625 (1R)
S3655 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3691 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee