NJ A1616 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3807
Note: Carry Over of previous S2683
Note: Carry Over of previous S2683
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S550 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S550 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain student identification cards to contain telephone number for suicide prevention hotline.
Title
Requires certain student identification cards to contain telephone number for suicide prevention hotline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S550 (1R) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3807 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S550 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.261.
S2683 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S550 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.261.
S2683 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee