NJ A1601 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A961
Note: Carry Over of previous A4874
Note: Carry Over of previous A4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires licensure for manufacturers, distributors, wholesale dealers, and retail dealers of electronic smoking devices and related products.
Title
Requires licensure for manufacturers, distributors, wholesale dealers, and retail dealers of electronic smoking devices and related products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1601 (Carry Over) 2018-01-29 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4874 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1949 (Same As) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4874 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1949 (Same As) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee