NJ A157 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A132
Note: Carry Over of previous A123
Note: Carry Over of previous A123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that farm, farmstand, or other agricultural operation selling firewood obtained from property other than seller's shall not be considered a lumber yard.
Title
Provides that farm, farmstand, or other agricultural operation selling firewood obtained from property other than seller's shall not be considered a lumber yard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A157 (Carry Over) 2018-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A123 (Carry Over) 2016-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1795 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A123 (Carry Over) 2016-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1795 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A157 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A0500/157_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A157 |