NJ A1559 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous A6192
Note: Carry Over of previous S4239

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Substituted by S902 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes certain consumer protection requirements on service contract providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes certain consumer protection requirements on service contract providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Not Reported (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-16AssemblySubstituted by S902 (3R)
2022-05-26AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
2022-05-09AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2022-03-07AssemblyAmended but not reported
2022-01-11AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A6192 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S4239 (Carry Over) 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S902 (Same As) 2022-08-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.91.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback