NJ A1553 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S1729
Note: Carry Over of previous A5966
Note: Carry Over of previous S3901

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires gubernatorial and legislative candidates report contributions within 48 hours of receipt; requires Election Law Enforcement Commission to post reports within 72 hours of filing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires gubernatorial and legislative candidates report contributions within 48 hours of receipt; requires Election Law Enforcement Commission to post reports within 72 hours of filing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1553 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5966 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3901 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2119 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback