NJ A1531 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5255
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law concerning reciprocity for out-of-State professional and occupational licenses.
Title
Revises law concerning reciprocity for out-of-State professional and occupational licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S522 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S522 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.78. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S522 (1R) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5255 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S522 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A1531 (2R)
S522 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A1531 (2R)