NJ A1527 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4800
Note: Carryover of previous A4800

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Internet service providers to keep confidential and prohibit any disclosure, sale, or unauthorized access to subscriber's personally identifiable information unless subscriber authorizes Internet service provider in writing to disclose information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Internet service providers to keep confidential and prohibit any disclosure, sale, or unauthorized access to subscriber's personally identifiable information unless subscriber authorizes Internet service provider in writing to disclose information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4800 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4800 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2641 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - Transferred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback