NJ A1515 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1215
Note: Carry Over of previous A2448
Note: Carry Over of previous S56
Note: Carry Over of previous A2448
Note: Carry Over of previous S56
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits forum of certain consumer contract disputes to New Jersey.*
Title
Limits forum of certain consumer contract disputes to New Jersey.*
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-20-0) |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKeon) |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1515 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2448 (Carry Over) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S387 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S56 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2448 (Carry Over) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S387 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S56 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee