NJ A1488 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5868
Note: Carry Over of previous S3867
Note: Carry Over of previous S3867
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by S783 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by S783 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Opioid Recovery and Remediation Fund; establishes requirements for proceeds from opioid settlements to support substance use disorder prevention and treatment programs.
Title
Establishes Opioid Recovery and Remediation Fund; establishes requirements for proceeds from opioid settlements to support substance use disorder prevention and treatment programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Assembly | Substituted by S783 (2R) |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5868 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3867
S3867 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
S783 (Same As) 2023-03-17 - Approved P.L.2023, c.25.
S3867 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
S783 (Same As) 2023-03-17 - Approved P.L.2023, c.25.