NJ A1467 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1832
Note: Carry Foward to future S2131
Note: Carry Over of previous A4483
Note: Carry Over of previous A4483
Note: Carry Foward to future S2131
Note: Carry Over of previous A4483
Note: Carry Over of previous A4483
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits institution of higher education that provides child care from charging student-parent who receives child care voucher under "New Jersey Cares for Kids Program" an amount for child care in excess of voucher amount.
Title
Prohibits institution of higher education that provides child care from charging student-parent who receives child care voucher under "New Jersey Cares for Kids Program" an amount for child care in excess of voucher amount.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1467 (Carry Over) 2016-05-19 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1467 (Carry Over) 2016-05-19 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4483 (Carry Over) 2015-06-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4483 (Carry Over) 2017-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A1467 (Carry Over) 2016-05-19 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4483 (Carry Over) 2015-06-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4483 (Carry Over) 2017-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee